NM HB541 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (27-11) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (27-11) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher language proficiency & council
Title
Teacher language proficiency & council
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miera [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (27-11) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Education |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (37-30) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Referred to House Education |