NM HB54 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wage claim action court costs
Title
Wage claim action court costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources |
2014-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Labor & Human Resources and then to House Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |