NM HB535 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase certain felony sentences
Title
Increase certain felony sentences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (64-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] HSCAC |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to HSCAC |