NM HB524 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative voting locations in certain areas
Title
Alternative voting locations in certain areas
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] Passed House (38-31) |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Referred to House Voters & Elections |