NM HB501 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Questions with force of law on ballot
Title
Questions with force of law on ballot
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (40-19) |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | [LD 31] HGEIC |
2015-03-03 | House | [LD 31] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-05 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | [LD 13] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to HGEIC |