NM HB497 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 91.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 91.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic voter registration updates
Title
Electronic voter registration updates
Sponsors
Rep. James Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 91. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (34-5) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (64-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Referred to House Voters & Elections |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Assigned to House Voters & Elections and then to House Judiciary |