NM HB496 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] PASSED/S (33-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] PASSED/S (33-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
School district election notification
Title
School district election notification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/S (33-0) POCKET VETO. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] SRC- DP | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] fl/sub adptd- PASSED/H (69-0) | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] w/o rec | |
2011-02-25 | [LD 39] DP-HVEC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] HEC/HVEC-HEC |