NM HB47 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 232 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 232 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Employee & Assistants Probation Time
Title
School Employee & Assistants Probation Time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 232 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:19 N:14 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-04 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SJC |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:41 N:23 |
2019-02-20 | House | HINT Floor Amendment |
2019-02-20 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-25 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HEC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |