NM HB47 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Refund For National Guard Eligibility
Title
Tax Refund For National Guard Eligibility
Sponsors
Rep. David Adkins [R] | Sen. Carlos Cisneros [D] | Rep. Harry Garcia [D] | Rep. Sarah Maestas Barnes [R] |
Rep. Debbie Rodella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 4 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-03 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Passed House (66-0) |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] HSIVC |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to HSIVC and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |