NM HB448 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removal of lands from watershed districts
Title
Removal of lands from watershed districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.15) Ch. 17. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (67-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | [LD 16] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |
2013-02-05 | House | [LD 16] Assigned to House Agriculture & Water Resources and then to House Judiciary |