NM HB423 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Group Benefits Nonprofit Participation
Title
Group Benefits Nonprofit Participation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:39 N:28 |
2019-03-04 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-18 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HCEDC |