NM HB421 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Passed Senate (26-12) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Passed Senate (26-12) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nonprofit Entity Group Health Coverage
Title
Nonprofit Entity Group Health Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Passed Senate (26-12) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (64-2) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] HSIVC |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HHouse Health |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HHouse Health and then to HSIVC |