NM HB419 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer Or Sale Of Unused Angel Tax Credit
Title
Transfer Or Sale Of Unused Angel Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-03-10 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-03-09 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:2 |
2019-03-07 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-14 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HTRC |