NM HB414 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nurse practitioner scope of practice
Title
Nurse practitioner scope of practice
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (66-1) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Judiciary |