NM HB400 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Media Literacy Advisory Committee
Title
School Media Literacy Advisory Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2019-03-15 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:31 N:4 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0 |
2019-03-05 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-13 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-29 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |