NM HB398 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Osteopathic assistants, licensure & board
Title
Osteopathic assistants, licensure & board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (63-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Floor amendment adopteda |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] HHC |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to HHC |