NM HB396 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
College logo mobility limit license plate
Title
College logo mobility limit license plate
Sponsors
Rep. Emily Kane [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (65-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2013-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Appropriations & Finance |