NM HB395 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP-SFC- w/drn API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP-SFC- w/drn API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fire protection & jurisdictional lines
Title
Fire protection & jurisdictional lines
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP-SFC- w/drn API. | |
2011-02-16 | [LD 30] SJC/SFC-SJC | |
2011-02-25 | [LD 39] fl/a- PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP/a-HAFC | |
2011-02-03 | [LD 17] HHGAC/HAFC-HHGAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=395&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0395.pdf |