NM HB391 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] h/cncrd SGND (Apr.4) Ch. 46.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] h/cncrd SGND (Apr.4) Ch. 46.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Livestock code penalty for open gates
Title
Livestock code penalty for open gates
Sponsors
Rep. Dona Irwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] h/cncrd SGND (Apr.4) Ch. 46. | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP/a - PASSED/S (35-0) | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SJC | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] SCONC/SJC-SCONC | |
2011-02-19 | [LD 33] PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP/a | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP-HJC | |
2011-01-31 | [LD 14] HAGC/HJC-HAGC |