NM HB39 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 50 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 50 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grt Deduction For Nonathletic Special Events
Title
Grt Deduction For Nonathletic Special Events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 50 - Mar. 8 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:28 N:2 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-11 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SFC |
2022-02-05 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:1 |
2022-02-01 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-26 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-19 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HTRC |
2022-01-18 | House | Sent to HPREF |