NM HB387 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Add members to renewable energy authority
Title
Add members to renewable energy authority
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Roch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP API. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP-SCONC | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] SRC/SCONC-SRC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2011-02-25 | [LD 39] DP | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP-HHGAC | |
2011-01-31 | [LD 14] HENRC/HHGAC-HENRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=387&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0387.pdf |