NM HB38 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wireless Consumer Advanced Infrastructure
Title
Wireless Consumer Advanced Infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 18] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 17 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (34-3) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (54-10) |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] HLELC |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to HLELC and then to House Business & Industry |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |