NM HB38 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Forest & watershed restoration act
Title
Forest & watershed restoration act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Bandy [R] | Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Passed House (58-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] HEENC |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HAWC |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HAWC and then to HEENC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |