NM HB370 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 7 - Mar. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 7 - Mar. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surprise Billing Protection Act Sunset Date
Title
Surprise Billing Protection Act Sunset Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 7 - Mar. 15 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:0 |
2023-02-21 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-09 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |