NM HB370 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approach of towing vehicles on roadside
Title
Approach of towing vehicles on roadside
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (66-0) |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Floor amendment adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-29 | House | [LD 8] HSCAC |
2015-01-29 | House | [LD 8] HSCAC and then to House Judiciary |