NM HB362 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Apr.4) Ch. 45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Apr.4) Ch. 45.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certain military hunting license discounts
Title
Certain military hunting license discounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Apr.4) Ch. 45. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] SCONC | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (69-0) | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP-HBIC | |
2011-02-04 | [LD 18] w/drn - ref HENRC/HBIC-HENRC | |
2011-01-30 | [LD 13] HCPAC/HBIC-HCPAC |