NM HB36 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Tech research investment & administration
Title
Tech research investment & administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (65-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Taxation & Revenue and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Printed |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |