NM HB36 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' ptsd treatment pilot project
Title
Veterans' ptsd treatment pilot project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Education |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (70-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Education |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-01-15 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |