NM HB351 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unreimbursed medical expense tax deduction
Title
Unreimbursed medical expense tax deduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (57-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] HWMC |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] HHC |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] HHC and then to HWMC |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] HHC |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] HHC and then to HWMC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |