NM HB349 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Passed Senate (38-3) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Passed Senate (38-3) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Yield To Transit Buses Displaying Yield Sign
Title
Yield To Transit Buses Displaying Yield Sign
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (38-3) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (55-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Judiciary |