NM HB349 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dental health act changes & therapists
Title
Dental health act changes & therapists
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Roch [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (34-25) |
2015-03-13 | House | [LD 39] Floor amendment adopteda |
2015-03-09 | House | [LD 35] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-17 | House | [LD 21] HHC |
2015-02-17 | House | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to HHC |