NM HB346 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raise sexual exploitation age to 18
Title
Raise sexual exploitation age to 18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | House | [LD 35] Passed House (67-0) |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |