NM HB345 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SRC/SJC-SRC API.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SRC/SJC-SRC API.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State agency proposed rule statutory citation
Title
State agency proposed rule statutory citation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] SRC/SJC-SRC API. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP/a - PASSED/H (64-0) | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] DP/a-HJC | |
2011-01-30 | [LD 13] HHGAC/HJC-HHGAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=345&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0345.pdf |