NM HB338 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (35-4) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (35-4) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 78.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public defender dept. personnel policies
Title
Public defender dept. personnel policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (35-4) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 12) Ch. 78. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (60-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |