NM HB336 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 10 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (65-0) |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Not Printed |