NM HB328 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (38-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (38-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No alteration or sale of counterfeit airbags
Title
No alteration or sale of counterfeit airbags
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (38-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 43. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Passed House (61-0) |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-04 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Regulatory & Public Affairs |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Regulatory & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |