NM HB325 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare - Rural Air Service Enhancement Act
Title
Public Peace, Health, Safety & Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:55 N:8 |
2021-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-03-09 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-03-05 | House | Sent to HAFC |
2021-03-05 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar, ordered printed and referred to |
2021-02-18 | House | Not Printed |