NM HB321 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Car Registration Fee For Road Fund
Title
Car Registration Fee For Road Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-04 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to: HTRC |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-15 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-24 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HAFC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=321&year=19 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/19%20Regular/bills/house/HB0321.pdf |