NM HB32 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes In Evacuation Zone

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes In Evacuation Zone

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Passed House (49-16)
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-07House[LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary
2018-02-07House[LD 6] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2018-02-02House[LD 5] Referred to House Judiciary
2018-02-02House[LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-24House[LD 2] HLELC
2018-01-24House[LD 2] Assigned to HLELC and then to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance
2018-01-24House[LD 2] Printed
2018-01-24House[LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2018-01-24House[LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2018-01-16House[LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business
2018-01-16House[LD 1] Not Printed
2018-01-16House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback