NM HB312 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bail bondsmen qualifications
Title
Bail bondsmen qualifications
Sponsors
Rep. James Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 50] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (66-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-22 | House | [LD 29] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-22 | House | [LD 29] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2013-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |