NM HB31 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Affordable housing act violations & penalties
Title
Affordable housing act violations & penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (61-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Printed |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |