NM HB304 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 156 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 156 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Employee Retirement Needs Trusts
Title
Public Employee Retirement Needs Trusts
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 156 - Apr. 5 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:35 N:0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2023-02-28 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-22 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-06 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HAFC |