NM HB30 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Communication Of Certain Images To Children
Title
Communication Of Certain Images To Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (67-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Safety & Civil Affairs |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Safety & Civil Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |