NM HB287 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 66.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 66.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of state copying services
Title
Secretary of state copying services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 66. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Passed House (63-0) |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] HGEIC |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] HGEIC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |