NM HB277 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Administration Of Opioid Antagonists
Title
Administration Of Opioid Antagonists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | [LD 22] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 47 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (66-0) |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Health |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Health and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Printed |
2016-01-23 | House | [LD 5] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Not Printed |