NM HB277 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed Senate (33-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed Senate (33-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kinship guardianship changes
Title
Kinship guardianship changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (33-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 3) Ch. 28. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-12 | House | [LD 38] Passed House (66-0) |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] HGEIC |
2015-01-26 | House | [LD 5] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary |