NM HB273 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 58.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 58.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic development grant & program
Title
Economic development grant & program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 10) Ch. 58. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (67-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2014-01-29 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Appropriations & Finance |