NM HB270 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 114 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Autonomous Vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autonomous Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 114 - Apr. 6
2021-03-19SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:28 N:11
2021-03-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment
2021-03-14SenateSTBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2021-03-08SenateSent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC
2021-03-06HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:4
2021-03-06HouseFloor substitute adopted
2021-03-02HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2021-02-19HouseHTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-02-09HouseSent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HCEDC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback