NM HB270 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-17 - [LD 32] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home School Student Activity Participation
Title
Home School Student Activity Participation
Sponsors
Rep. Alonzo Baldonado [R] | Rep. Stephanie Richard [D] | Rep. Jimmie Hall [R] | Rep. Ricky Little [R] |
Rep. Dennis Roch [R] | Rep. James Strickler [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Referred to Senate Education |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (64-0) |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HSIVC |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HSIVC and then to House Education |