NM HB27 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expand lottery scholarship eligibility
Title
Expand lottery scholarship eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Education |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (49-13) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | [LD 25] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-02-18 | House | [LD 25] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | [LD 25] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Education |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-01-15 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |